Magical 19×19 multiplication formula used by Indians to calculate in just 4 steps that is super easy and quick

0
369

Let we teach you a simple method to do your multiplications. It is very easy and convenient way to solve your multiplications!

Generally, when a child is able to memorize the multiplication tables of 1-9, it is considered a big achievement! However for children in India, they are already memorizing multiplication tables of 1-19!

India’s multiplication tables are from 1 till 19 (19×19 multiplication). Sounds challenging and difficult but if you feel daunted to memorise it, there is a quick way to do the calculation.

India’s method of calculations

Here we will introduce you India’s multiplications method.

It really is amazing!

Calculate by heart the equation below and write down your answer:

13×12=?

Indians calculate their answer like this:

First, ’12’ will be separated to form (1) and (2).

Secondly, the first value (13) will be added with (2), hence, 13+2=15

Thirdly, we will add a zero behind 15 or multiply 15 by 10 to make it 150.

Fourthly, multiply the last digit from ’13’ which is (3) and the last digit from ’12’ which is (2), thus, 3×2=6

Finally, the calculation will look like this:

(13+2)x10+(2×3)=

(15×10)+6=

150+6=156

Wow, isn’t it easy as ABC ?

With this method, multiplication 11×11 till 19×19 becomes quicker and easier to calculate!

Let us try to calculate the questions below:

14 x 13:
1) 14 + 3 = 17
2) 17 x 10 = 170
3) 4 x 3 = 12
4) 170 + 12 = 182

16 x 17:
1) 16 + 7 = 23
2) 23 x 10 = 230
3) 6 x 7 = 42
4) 230 + 42 = 272

19 x 19
1) 19 + 9 = 28
2) 28 x 10 = 280
3) 9 x 9 = 81
4) 280 + 81 = 361

It really is easy to calculate! What do you think of this method? Let us quickly teach our children this calculation method!

LEAVE A REPLY

Please enter your comment!
Please enter your name here